Refine your search

Refined by:

Illinois Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 01/30/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 01/31/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/06/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/14/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/15/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/16/2007