Refine your search

Refined by:

North Carolina Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/24/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 01/29/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 01/30/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/30/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 04/18/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 01/22/2008