Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 01/22/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 01/24/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/24/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/30/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 02/07/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 03/12/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/06/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/26/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 12/05/2007