Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/10/2008
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 06/12/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/12/2008
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/12/2008
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/12/2008
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 06/12/2008
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 06/12/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/12/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/12/2008
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/12/2008
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/12/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/20/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/20/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 06/20/2008
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/20/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 06/23/2008
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 06/26/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 06/26/2008
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/26/2008
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 06/26/2008
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/26/2008
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 06/26/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 06/26/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/26/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/26/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 07/09/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 07/09/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 07/09/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/09/2008
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/09/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 07/09/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/09/2008
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 07/09/2008
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/09/2008
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 07/09/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 07/09/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/09/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/10/2008