Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/12/2008
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/17/2008
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 06/17/2008
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/18/2008
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/18/2008
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 06/19/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/19/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/20/2008
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/20/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 06/24/2008
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/24/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 06/24/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/24/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/24/2008
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 06/24/2008
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/24/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/24/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/24/2008
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/24/2008
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 06/24/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 06/24/2008
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/24/2008
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 06/24/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/25/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/25/2008
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/25/2008
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/25/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/25/2008
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/25/2008
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/25/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/25/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/25/2008
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 06/25/2008
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/25/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/25/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/25/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/25/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/25/2008
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/25/2008
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 06/26/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/26/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/26/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/26/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/26/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/26/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/09/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/09/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/09/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 07/10/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/10/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/17/2008
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 07/17/2008
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/22/2008
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/24/2008
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 07/24/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/29/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 08/01/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 08/01/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/09/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/09/2008
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 09/09/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/17/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/29/2008