Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 06/09/2008
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 06/09/2008
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 06/09/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 06/09/2008
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 06/09/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 06/09/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 06/09/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 06/09/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 06/09/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 06/09/2008
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 06/09/2008
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 06/11/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/11/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/11/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/11/2008
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 06/12/2008
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/12/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/17/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/17/2008
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/19/2008
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 06/19/2008
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 06/19/2008
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/20/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 06/20/2008
Rep. Cazayoux, Donald J., Jr. [D-LA-6] 06/24/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 06/25/2008
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/26/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/09/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/09/2008
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 07/09/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 07/10/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/14/2008
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 07/14/2008
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 07/14/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/14/2008
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 07/16/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/16/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/17/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 07/21/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/21/2008
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 07/22/2008
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 07/23/2008
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/31/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/31/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 08/01/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 08/01/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 09/09/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/09/2008
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 09/09/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/09/2008