Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/09/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 06/09/2008
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/14/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/14/2008
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/15/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/15/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/15/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 07/15/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/15/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/15/2008
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 07/15/2008
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 07/15/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/15/2008
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 07/15/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/15/2008
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/15/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/15/2008
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/15/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/15/2008
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 07/15/2008
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/15/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 07/15/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 07/15/2008
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/15/2008
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 07/15/2008
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 07/15/2008
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/15/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/15/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 07/15/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 07/15/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/15/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 07/15/2008
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 07/15/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/15/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/15/2008
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/15/2008
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/15/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/15/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 07/15/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/15/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 07/15/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/15/2008
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/15/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/15/2008
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/15/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/15/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 07/15/2008
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 07/15/2008
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 07/22/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 07/22/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/22/2008
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 07/22/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 07/22/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/22/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/22/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/22/2008
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/23/2008
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 07/24/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/30/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/30/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 08/01/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/15/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/25/2008
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 09/25/2008
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 09/25/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/25/2008
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 09/25/2008
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 09/25/2008
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 09/25/2008
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 09/25/2008
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/25/2008
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/25/2008
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/25/2008
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/25/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 09/25/2008
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 09/25/2008
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/25/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/25/2008
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 09/25/2008
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 09/25/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/25/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 09/25/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/25/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/25/2008
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/25/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/25/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/25/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/25/2008
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/25/2008
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 09/25/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/25/2008
Rep. Cazayoux, Donald J., Jr. [D-LA-6] 09/25/2008
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 09/25/2008
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 09/25/2008
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/25/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 09/25/2008
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 09/25/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/25/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/25/2008
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 09/25/2008