Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 06/11/2008
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 06/11/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 06/11/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 06/11/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 06/11/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/12/2008
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 06/18/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/19/2008
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/24/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 06/24/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/25/2008
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 09/16/2008

Show cosponsors who withdrew