There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Free Trade With Cuba Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To lift the trade embargo on Cuba, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/22/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date
04/12/2007Referred to the Subcommittee on Domestic and International Monetary Policy, Trade, and Technology.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
03/20/2007Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Workforce, Post Office, and the District of Columbia.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
03/01/2007Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration, Citizenship, Refugees, Border Security, and International Law.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/08/2007Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E295-297)
Action By: House of Representatives
02/02/2007Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Trade and Consumer Protection.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/02/2007Referred to the Subcommittee on Telecommunications and the Internet.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
01/30/2007Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
01/22/2007Referred to House Agriculture
Action By: House of Representatives
01/22/2007Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
Action By: House of Representatives
01/22/2007Referred to House Financial Services
Action By: House of Representatives
01/22/2007Referred to House Judiciary
Action By: House of Representatives
01/22/2007Referred to House Energy and Commerce
Action By: House of Representatives
01/22/2007Referred to House Ways and Means
Action By: House of Representatives
01/22/2007Referred to House Foreign Affairs
Action By: House of Representatives
01/22/2007Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Energy and Commerce, the Judiciary, Financial Services, Oversight and Government Reform, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/22/2007Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (54)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/06/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/06/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/06/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/06/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/06/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/06/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 02/13/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/13/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 02/13/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 02/13/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/13/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/13/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 02/13/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/13/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 02/13/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/13/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/28/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/28/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/28/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/28/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/28/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/28/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/28/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 02/28/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/09/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/09/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/09/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/20/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/20/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/20/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/20/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 03/20/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/20/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/20/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/18/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/18/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/01/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/01/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/01/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/01/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/16/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/16/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/19/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/19/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/19/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/26/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 06/26/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/26/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/26/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/26/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/26/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/19/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 01/17/2008

Committees (7)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs01/22/2007 Referred to
House Ways and Means01/22/2007 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Trade01/30/2007 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce01/22/2007 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Telecommunications and the Internet02/02/2007 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Commerce, Trade and Consumer Protection02/02/2007 Referred to
House Judiciary01/22/2007 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration, Citizenship, Refugees, Border Security, and International Law03/01/2007 Referred to
House Financial Services01/22/2007 Referred to
House Financial Services Subcommittee on Domestic and International Monetary Policy, Trade, and Technology04/12/2007 Referred to
House Oversight and Government Reform01/22/2007 Referred to
House Oversight and Government Reform Subcommittee on Federal Workforce, Post Office, and the District of Columbia03/20/2007 Referred to
House Agriculture01/22/2007 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.624.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.624. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/22/2007)

Free Trade With Cuba Act - Amends the Foreign Assistance Act of 1961 to repeal the embargo on trade with Cuba.

Prohibits the exercise by the President with respect to Cuba of certain authorities conferred by the Trading With the Enemy Act and exercised on July 1, 1977, as a result of a specified national emergency. Declares that any prohibition on exports to Cuba under the Export Administration Act of 1979 shall cease to be effective. Authorizes the President to impose export controls with respect to Cuba and exercise certain authorities under the International Emergency Economic Powers Act only on account of an unusual and extraordinary threat to U.S. national security that did not exist before enactment of this Act.

Repeals: (1) the Cuban Democracy Act of 1992; (2) the Cuban Liberty and Democratic Solidarity (LIBERTAD) Act of 1996; (3) the prohibition under the Food Security Act of 1985 against allocation of the annual sugar quota to any country unless its officials verify that it does not import for reexport to the United States any sugar produced in Cuba; and (4) the prohibition under the Department of Commerce and Related Agencies Appropriations Act, 1999 on transactions or payments respecting certain U.S. intellectual property.

Amends the Trade Sanctions Reform and Export Enhancement Act of 2000 to remove Cuba from the list of state sponsors of terrorism subject to agricultural and medical export restrictions.

Amends the Internal Revenue Code to terminate the denial of foreign tax credit with respect to Cuba.

Authorizes common carriers to install and repair telecommunications equipment and facilities in Cuba, and otherwise provide telecommunications services between the United States and Cuba.

Prohibits regulation or banning of travel to and from Cuba by U.S. citizens or residents, or of any transactions incident to travel.

Directs the U.S. Postal Service to provide direct mail service to and from Cuba.

Urges the President to take all necessary steps to conduct negotiations with the Government of Cuba to: (1) settle claims of U.S. nationals against Cuba for the taking of property; and (2) secure protection of internationally recognized human rights.