Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 06/12/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/12/2008
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 06/12/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 06/12/2008
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 06/12/2008
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 06/12/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/12/2008
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 06/12/2008
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/12/2008
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 06/12/2008
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 06/17/2008
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/17/2008
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 06/17/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/17/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/17/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/17/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/17/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 06/17/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/17/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/17/2008
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/17/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 06/17/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/17/2008
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/17/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/17/2008
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 06/18/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/18/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/18/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/18/2008
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 06/18/2008
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 06/18/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/18/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/19/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 06/19/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/19/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/23/2008
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/23/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 06/23/2008
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 06/23/2008
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/23/2008
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 06/23/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/23/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/23/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/23/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 06/23/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/23/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/23/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/23/2008
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/23/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/24/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/24/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/24/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/24/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 06/24/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 06/24/2008
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 06/24/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/24/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/24/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/26/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 06/26/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 06/26/2008