Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 06/12/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 06/12/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 06/12/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 06/12/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 06/12/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/12/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 06/12/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/18/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/18/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/18/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/20/2008
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/20/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/20/2008
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/20/2008
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/20/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/20/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 06/20/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/20/2008
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/20/2008
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 06/20/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/20/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/20/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/20/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/20/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/20/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/20/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 06/20/2008
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/20/2008
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/20/2008
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 06/20/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/20/2008
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/20/2008
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/20/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/20/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/20/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/20/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/20/2008
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/20/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/20/2008
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/20/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/20/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 06/20/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/20/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/20/2008
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/20/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/20/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/20/2008
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/20/2008
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 06/20/2008
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/20/2008
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 06/20/2008
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 06/20/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/20/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/20/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/20/2008
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/20/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/20/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 06/20/2008
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 06/20/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/20/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/20/2008
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/20/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/20/2008
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/20/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/20/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 06/20/2008
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 06/20/2008
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/20/2008
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 06/20/2008
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/20/2008
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/20/2008
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/20/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/20/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/20/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/20/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/20/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/20/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/20/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/20/2008
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/20/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/20/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 06/20/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/20/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/20/2008
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/20/2008
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 06/20/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 06/20/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/20/2008
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/20/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/20/2008
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/20/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/20/2008
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/20/2008
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 06/20/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/20/2008
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 06/20/2008
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/20/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 06/20/2008
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 06/20/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/20/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/20/2008
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/20/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/20/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/20/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/20/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/20/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/20/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/20/2008
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/20/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/20/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/20/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 06/20/2008
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/25/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/25/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/25/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/25/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/25/2008
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/25/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/26/2008
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 08/01/2008

Show cosponsors who withdrew