Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 01/22/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 01/22/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 01/22/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 01/23/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 01/23/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/29/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 01/29/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 02/15/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 03/05/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/09/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 04/19/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/14/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 09/25/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/27/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/10/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/12/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/01/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 11/05/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/06/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 11/07/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 11/07/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 11/08/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 11/09/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/13/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 11/14/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 11/15/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 11/15/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 11/15/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 11/15/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 11/15/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 11/15/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 11/15/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 12/04/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 12/04/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 12/04/2007
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/22/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/10/2008