There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

SMOCTA Reauthorization Act of 2008

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize discretionary appropriations to carry out the Service Members Occupational Conversion and Training Act of 1992.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/12/2008Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date
07/02/2008Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
06/26/2008Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
06/26/2008Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
06/19/2008Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
06/13/2008Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
06/12/2008Referred to House Education and Labor
Action By: House of Representatives
06/12/2008Referred to House Veterans' Affairs
Action By: House of Representatives
06/12/2008Referred to House Armed Services
Action By: House of Representatives
06/12/2008Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Veterans' Affairs, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/12/2008Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 06/12/2008
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/20/2008

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services06/12/2008 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel07/02/2008 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs06/12/2008 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity06/13/2008 Referred to
06/19/2008 Hearings by
06/26/2008 Markup by
06/26/2008 Reported by
House Education and Labor06/12/2008 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.6272.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6272. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/12/2008)

SMOCTA Reauthorization Act of 2008 - Authorizes appropriations for FY2009-FY2018 to carry out the Service Members Occupational Conversion and Training Act of 1992.