Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 06/17/2008
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 06/17/2008
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 06/17/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 06/17/2008
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 06/17/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 06/17/2008
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/17/2008
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14]* 06/17/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 06/17/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/17/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 06/17/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/18/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/23/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/08/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/25/2008