There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Helping Families Adopt Orphans Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Homeland Security to ensure that an individual may file an orphan petition for at least 2 years after approval of an advanced processing application.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/22/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
03/01/2007Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration, Citizenship, Refugees, Border Security, and International Law.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/22/2007Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/22/2007Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (75)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 01/31/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 01/31/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 01/31/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 01/31/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 01/31/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 01/31/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 01/31/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 01/31/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 01/31/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/31/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 01/31/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/31/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 01/31/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/08/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/08/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/08/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/08/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 02/08/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 02/14/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/14/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 02/14/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 02/14/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/14/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 02/14/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/27/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 02/27/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/27/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 03/01/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 03/01/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/01/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/01/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 03/01/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 03/01/2007
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/01/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/01/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/01/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/01/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/01/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/01/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/01/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/01/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/01/2007
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 03/01/2007
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 03/01/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/01/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/01/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 03/01/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/01/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/01/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/01/2007
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 03/01/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/01/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/01/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/01/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 03/09/2007
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 03/09/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/09/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/09/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/09/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/20/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 03/20/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 03/23/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 03/23/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 03/29/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 03/29/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/17/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/17/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/17/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/01/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/17/2007

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/22/2007 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration, Citizenship, Refugees, Border Security, and International Law03/01/2007 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.628.


Subjects (11)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.628. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/22/2007)

Helping Families Adopt Orphans Act - Directs the Secretary of Homeland Security to ensure that any "covered individual" (an individual whose Application for Advanced Processing of Orphan Petition was approved on or after July 1, 2005) may file a Petition to Classify Orphan as an Immediate Relative for at least two years after the approval of the individual's application.

Prohibits the Secretary from requiring: (1) a covered individual who files a timely petition to pay any fees or complete any requirements already paid or completed in conjunction with the application or contingent on the amount of time that elapses between the application's approval and the petition's filing; and (2) any person who was a covered individual on this Act's enactment date from paying any fee for the timely filing of a petition unless that fee was required at the time the application was approved.