Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 01/22/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 01/31/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 01/31/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 01/31/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 01/31/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 01/31/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 01/31/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 01/31/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 01/31/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 01/31/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/31/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 01/31/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/31/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 01/31/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/08/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/08/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/08/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/08/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 02/08/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 02/14/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/14/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 02/14/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 02/14/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/14/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 02/14/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/27/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 02/27/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/27/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 03/01/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 03/01/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/01/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/01/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 03/01/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 03/01/2007
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/01/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/01/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/01/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/01/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/01/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/01/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/01/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/01/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/01/2007
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 03/01/2007
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 03/01/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/01/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/01/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 03/01/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/01/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/01/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/01/2007
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 03/01/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/01/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/01/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/01/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 03/09/2007
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 03/09/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/09/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/09/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/09/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/20/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 03/20/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 03/23/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 03/23/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 03/29/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 03/29/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/17/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/17/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/17/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/01/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/17/2007