Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 06/17/2008
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 06/17/2008
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 06/17/2008
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/18/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/26/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/08/2008
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 07/09/2008
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/14/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/14/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/16/2008
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/17/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 09/10/2008