Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 01/17/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 01/17/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 01/17/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 01/17/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 01/17/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 01/17/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 01/17/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 01/17/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 01/17/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 01/17/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 01/17/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 01/17/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 01/17/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 01/17/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 01/17/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 01/17/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 01/17/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 01/17/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/17/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 01/17/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/05/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/05/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 02/05/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/05/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/05/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 02/05/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 02/05/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 02/05/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 02/05/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 02/05/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 02/05/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 02/05/2007
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 02/05/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 02/05/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/05/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/13/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/13/2007
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 03/21/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/21/2007
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 03/21/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/28/2007
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/17/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/17/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 05/24/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/13/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/06/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/10/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/20/2008