Limit your search

1-5 of 5
  1. S.Amdt.5066   — 110th Congress (2007-2008)

    Purpose To stay pending cases against certain telecommunications companies and provide that such companies may not seek retroactive immunity until 90 days after the date the final report of the Inspectors General on the President's Surveillance Program is submitted to Congress.
    Sponsor: Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] (Submitted 07/07/2008) (Proposed 07/08/2008)
    Latest Action: 07/09/08 Proposed amendment SA 5066, pursuant to the order of June 26, 2008, having failed to achieve the required 60 votes in the affirmative, was withdrawn in Senate.
  2. S.Amdt.5064   — 110th Congress (2007-2008)

    Purpose To strike title II.
    Sponsor: Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] (Submitted 06/26/2008) (Proposed 07/08/2008)
    Latest Action: 07/09/08 Amendment SA 5064 not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 32 - 66. Record Vote Number: 164.
  3. S.Amdt.5060   — 110th Congress (2007-2008)

    Sponsor: Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] (Submitted 06/26/2008)
  4. S.Amdt.5059   — 110th Congress (2007-2008)

    Purpose To limit retroactive immunity for providing assistance to the United States to instances in which a Federal court determines the assistance was provided in connection with an intelligence activity that was constitutional.
    Sponsor: Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] (Submitted 06/25/2008) (Proposed 07/08/2008)
    Latest Action: 07/09/08 Proposed amendment SA 5059, pursuant to the order of June 26, 2008, having failed to achieve the required 60 votes in the affirmative, was withdrawn in Senate.
  5. S.Amdt.5058   — 110th Congress (2007-2008)

    Sponsor: Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] (Submitted 06/25/2008)