Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 01/31/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/06/2007
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 02/06/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/15/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 02/15/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 02/15/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/08/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/08/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/08/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/08/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/08/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 03/08/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 03/12/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 03/12/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 03/12/2007
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 03/12/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/12/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/12/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/12/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/12/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 03/29/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/18/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/23/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/23/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/26/2007
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 07/11/2007
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 07/11/2007
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 01/16/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/26/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/11/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/15/2008