Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 07/09/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/09/2008
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 07/14/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 07/17/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 09/23/2008
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 09/24/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 09/26/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 10/03/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 11/20/2008