Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 06/19/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/19/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 06/19/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/19/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 06/19/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 06/26/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/26/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/26/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/26/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/26/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/26/2008
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/26/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/26/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/26/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/15/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/15/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/15/2008
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/17/2008
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 08/01/2008