There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

H-Prize Act of 2007

Short Titles as Reported to House

H-Prize Act of 2007

Short Titles as Introduced

H-Prize Act of 2007

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the Secretary of Energy to establish monetary prizes for achievements in overcoming scientific and technical barriers associated with hydrogen energy.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
06/06/2007Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 408 - 8 (Roll no. 433).(text: CR H6027-6029)
06/05/2007Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Science and Technology. H. Rept. 110-171.
01/23/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
07/17/2007SenateStar Print ordered on the bill.
06/07/2007SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
06/06/2007-2:23pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/06/2007-2:23pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 408 - 8 (Roll no. 433). (text: CR H6027-6029)
06/06/2007-2:17pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6047)
06/06/2007-12:13pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
06/06/2007-11:50amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 632.
06/06/2007-11:50amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6027-6031)
06/06/2007-11:49amHouseMr. Lipinski moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
06/05/2007HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 103.
06/05/2007HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Science and Technology. H. Rept. 110-171.
Action By: Committee on Science and Technology
05/23/2007HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Science and Technology
05/10/2007HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Science and Technology
05/10/2007HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Science and Technology
01/23/2007HouseReferred to the House Committee on Science and Technology.
01/23/2007HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (37)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 01/23/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 01/29/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/29/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/29/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 01/29/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 01/29/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 02/08/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/08/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 02/08/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/29/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/14/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/24/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 06/05/2007

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Science and Technology01/23/2007 Referred to
05/23/2007 Markup by
06/05/2007 Reported by H. Rept. 110-171
Senate Energy and Natural Resources06/07/2007 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.632. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (06/06/2007)

H-Prize Act of 2007 - (Sec. 3) Directs the Secretary of Energy to: (1) award competitive cash prizes biennially to advance the research, development, demonstration, and commercial application of hydrogen energy technologies; and (2) enter into an agreement with a private, nonprofit entity to administer the prize competitions.

Authorizes the Secretary to use appropriated funds for the cash prize program, including certain funds from other federal agencies.

(Sec. 4) Designates prize-eligible categories, including: (1) advancements in certain hydrogen technologies, components, or systems related to hydrogen production, storage, distribution, and utilization; (2) prototypes of hydrogen-powered vehicles or other hydrogen-based products that meet or exceed certain performance criteria; and (3) transformational changes in technologies for hydrogen distribution or production that meet or exceed far-reaching criteria, including minimal carbon emissions, and which may include cost criteria designed to facilitate the eventual market success of a winning technology.

Requires the Secretary to consult with designated agencies when establishing criteria for such awards.

(Sec. 6) Declares that the federal government shall not, by virtue of offering or awarding a prize under this Act, be entitled to any intellectual property rights derived as a consequence of, or direct relation to, the participation by a registered participant in a competition authorized by this Act. States that this Act shall not be construed to prevent the federal government from negotiating a license for the use of intellectual property developed for a prize competition under this Act.

(Sec. 7) Authorizes the Secretary to require registered participants in the awards program to waive claims against the federal government and the administering entity (except claims for willful misconduct) for any injury, death, damage, or loss of property, revenue, or profits arising from the participants' participation in a competition under this Act. Prohibits the Secretary, however, from requiring a registered participant to waive claims against the administering entity arising out of any unauthorized use or disclosure by the entity of the registered participant's trade secrets or confidential business information.

Sets forth liability insurance or alternative financial responsibility requirements for registered participants with regard to third party or federal government claims against them.

(Sec. 8) Instructs the Secretary to report to Congress regarding: (1) identification of the award recipient; (2) description of the technologies developed by each award recipient; and (3) specific actions being taken toward commercial application of all technologies with respect to which a prize has been awarded under this Act.

(Sec. 9) Authorizes appropriations for FY2008-FY2017.