Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 01/23/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 01/29/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/29/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/29/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 01/29/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 01/29/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 02/08/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/08/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 02/08/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/29/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/14/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/24/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 06/05/2007