Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Public Law (06/30/2008)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on June 24, 2008. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Federal Aviation Administration Extension Act of 2008 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to extend through FY2008: (1) excise taxes on aviation fuels and air transportation of persons and property; and (2) the expenditure authority for the Airport and Airway Trust Fund.

Amends federal transportation laws to extend funding through September 30, 2008, for various airport development projects, including: (1) the pilot program for passenger facility fees at nonhub airports; (2) state and local airport compatibility projects; (3) airport improvement projects; (4) Midway Island airport development; (5) small airport grants for airports located in the Marshall Islands, Micronesia, and Palau; and (6) airport planning and development grant programs.

Extends through November 30, 2008, Department of Transportation (DOT) insurance coverage for domestic air carriers.

Extends through March 31, 2009, air carrier liability limits for injuries to passengers resulting from acts of terrorism.