Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 06/20/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 06/20/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 06/20/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 06/20/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 06/20/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 06/20/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 06/20/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/20/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 06/20/2008
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 06/20/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 06/20/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 06/20/2008
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 06/20/2008
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 06/20/2008
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 06/20/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 06/20/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 06/20/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 06/20/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/20/2008
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 06/20/2008
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 06/20/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 06/20/2008
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 06/20/2008
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 06/20/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 06/20/2008
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 06/20/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/20/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 06/20/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 06/20/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 06/20/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 06/20/2008
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 06/20/2008
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 06/20/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2]* 06/20/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/20/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/20/2008
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 06/20/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 06/20/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 06/20/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 06/20/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 06/20/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/20/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 06/20/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 06/20/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 06/20/2008
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/23/2008
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/23/2008
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 06/23/2008
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/23/2008
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 06/23/2008
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/25/2008
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 06/25/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 06/25/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/25/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/25/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/25/2008
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/25/2008
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 06/26/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/08/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/09/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 07/09/2008
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/17/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/24/2008
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/24/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/29/2008
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/31/2008