There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 4233 West Hillsboro Boulevard in Coconut Creek, Florida, as the "Army SPC Daniel Agami Post Office Building".


Actions Overview (6)

Date
10/13/2008Became Public Law No: 110-397. (TXT | PDF)
10/13/2008Signed by President.
10/07/2008Presented to President.
09/30/2008Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S10129-10130)
09/18/2008Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR 9/17/2008 H8328)
06/20/2008Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
10/13/2008Became Public Law No: 110-397. (TXT | PDF)
10/13/2008Signed by President.
10/07/2008HousePresented to President.
09/30/2008SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/30/2008SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S10129-10130)
09/22/2008SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
09/18/2008-5:52pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/18/2008-5:52pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR 9/17/2008 H8328)
09/18/2008-5:52pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8454)
09/17/2008-2:36pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Ms. Foxx objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
09/17/2008-2:26pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6338.
09/17/2008-2:26pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8328-8329)
09/17/2008-2:26pmHouseMr. Davis (IL) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
07/16/2008HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
07/16/2008HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/20/2008HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
06/20/2008HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform06/20/2008 Referred to
07/16/2008 Markup by

No related bill information was received for H.R.6338.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.6338. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 110-397 (10/13/2008)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 4233 West Hillsboro Boulevard in Coconut Creek, Florida, as the "Army SPC Daniel Agami Post Office Building."