There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To designate the Federal building and United States courthouse located at 300 Quarropas Street in White Plains, New York, as the "Charles L. Brieant, Jr., Federal Building and United States Courthouse".

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the Federal building and United States Courthouse located at 300 Quarropas Street in White Plains, New York, as the "Charles L. Brieant, Jr. Federal Building and United States Courthouse".


Actions Overview (6)

Date Actions Overview
08/12/2008Became Public Law No: 110-311. (TXT | PDF)
08/12/2008Signed by President.
08/06/2008Presented to President.
08/01/2008Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8004)
07/29/2008Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7174)
06/20/2008Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber All Actions
08/12/2008Became Public Law No: 110-311. (TXT | PDF)
08/12/2008Signed by President.
08/06/2008HousePresented to President.
08/01/2008SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/01/2008SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8004)
07/29/2008SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
07/29/2008-6:39pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
07/29/2008-6:39pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/29/2008-6:39pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7174)
07/29/2008-6:38pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7267)
07/29/2008-12:24pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Boozman objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
07/29/2008-12:15pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6340.
07/29/2008-12:15pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7174-7175)
07/29/2008-12:15pmHouseMs. Norton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
06/23/2008HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
06/20/2008HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
06/20/2008HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (28)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure06/20/2008 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management06/23/2008 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.6340.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.6340. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 110-311 (08/01/2008)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates the federal building and U.S. courthouse located at 300 Quarropas Street in White Plains, New York, as the "Charles L. Brieant, Jr. Federal Building and United States Courthouse."