Refine your search

Showing 8 of 8 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
10/15/2008 Became Public Law No: 110-425.
10/15/2008 Signed by President.
10/06/2008 Presented to President.
09/30/2008 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S10184-10185)
09/23/2008 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8691-8694)
09/23/2008 Committee on Judiciary discharged.
09/23/2008 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 110-869, Part I.
06/24/2008 Introduced in House