Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 06/24/2008
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 06/24/2008
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 06/24/2008
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 06/24/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 06/24/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 06/24/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 06/24/2008
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 06/24/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/26/2008
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/09/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 07/22/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/24/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/15/2008