There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Korean War Veterans Recognition Act of 2008

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 4, United States Code, to add National Korean War Veterans Armistice Day to the list of days on which the flag should especially be displayed.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/25/2008Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
06/26/2008Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1362-1363)
Action By: House of Representatives
06/25/2008Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/25/2008Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/17/2008
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 07/17/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/17/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/24/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/24/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/29/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/16/2008

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary06/25/2008 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6363. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/25/2008)

Korean War Veterans Recognition Act of 2008 - Adds National Korean War Veterans Armistice Day, July 27, to the list of days on which the flag of the United States should be displayed.