Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 06/25/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3]* 06/25/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 06/25/2008
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 06/25/2008
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 06/25/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1]* 06/25/2008
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/26/2008
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 07/08/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/08/2008
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 07/14/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/16/2008
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/30/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 09/10/2008