There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Oregon Surplus Federal Land Act of 2008

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Oregon Surplus Federal Land Act of 2008

Short Titles as Reported to House

Oregon Surplus Federal Land Act of 2008

Short Titles as Introduced

Oregon Surplus Federal Land Act of 2008

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Oregon Surplus Federal Land Act of 2008

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To transfer excess Federal property administered by the Coast Guard to the Confederated Tribes of the Coos, Lower Umpqua, and Siuslaw Indians.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
10/08/2008Became Public Law No: 110-364. (TXT | PDF)
10/08/2008Signed by President.
09/30/2008Presented to President.
09/24/2008Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9434)
09/22/2008Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8530)
09/22/2008Reported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 110-865.
06/25/2008Introduced in House

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber
10/08/2008Became Public Law No: 110-364. (TXT | PDF)
10/08/2008Signed by President.
09/30/2008HousePresented to President.
09/25/2008SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/24/2008SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9434)
09/23/2008SenateReceived in the Senate.
09/22/2008-3:36pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/22/2008-3:36pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8530)
09/22/2008-3:32pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6370.
09/22/2008-3:32pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8530-8532)
09/22/2008-3:32pmHouseMr. DeFazio moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/22/2008HouseReported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 110-865.
09/22/2008HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 562.
07/31/2008HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
07/31/2008HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/31/2008HouseSubcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation Discharged.
06/26/2008HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
06/25/2008HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
06/25/2008HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure06/25/2008 Referred to
07/31/2008 Markup by
09/22/2008 Reported by H. Rept. 110-865
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation06/26/2008 Referred to
07/31/2008 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.6370. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 110-364 (10/08/2008)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

Oregon Surplus Federal Land Act of 2008 - Requires transfer of administrative jurisdiction over Coast Guard lands in Coos County, Oregon (including Cape Arago Light Station on Chief's Island), in the areas commonly known as Gregory Point and Chief's Island, to the Secretary of the Interior to hold in trust for the benefit of the Confederated Tribes of the Coos, Lower Umpqua, and Siuslaw Indians. Requires that, before the transfer, the Coast Guard commandant comply with all environmental and cultural resources laws. Requires that the land be included in the reservation of those tribes. Allows the Coast Guard to retain easements for access to aids to navigation.