Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/25/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/08/2008
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 07/09/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/10/2008
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/21/2008
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45] 07/22/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/22/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/24/2008
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/29/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/29/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/08/2008
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/08/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/08/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/10/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/11/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 09/26/2008
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 09/26/2008
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/26/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/28/2008