There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Federal Exploration and Production Reform Act of 2008

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To expedite the exploration and development of oil and gas from Federal lands, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/26/2008 Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
07/14/2008 Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/26/2008 Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/26/2008 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (48)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/16/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 07/16/2008
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/16/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 07/21/2008
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 07/21/2008
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/21/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/21/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/22/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/22/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/23/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 07/23/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 07/23/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 07/29/2008
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 07/29/2008
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 07/30/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/30/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/30/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 07/30/2008
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/30/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/30/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/30/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/30/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/30/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/30/2008
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 07/30/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 07/30/2008
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 07/30/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/30/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/30/2008
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/30/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/30/2008
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/30/2008
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 07/30/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 07/30/2008
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 07/30/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 07/30/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 07/30/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 07/30/2008
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 07/30/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/30/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/30/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/31/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/31/2008
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 07/31/2008
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/31/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 09/08/2008
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 09/10/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 09/16/2008

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources06/26/2008 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources07/14/2008 Referred to

Related Bills (0)

No related bill information was received for H.R.6379.

Subjects (24)

  • Coastal zone
  • Continental shelf
  • Energy development
  • Gas in submerged lands
  • Gas industry
  • Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
  • Marine resources conservation
  • Natural gas
  • Ocean energy resources
  • Oil and gas leases
  • Oil well drilling
  • Petroleum
  • Petroleum in submerged lands
  • Petroleum industry
  • Planning
  • Prospecting
  • Reclamation of land
  • Restoration ecology
  • Surety and fidelity

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6379. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/26/2008)

Federal Exploration and Production Reform Act of 2008 - Amends the Outer Continental Shelf Lands Act to revise requirements for review and approval of outer Continental Shelf (OCS) plans for geological and geophysical exploration on any area under an oil and gas lease. Repeals the requirement that approval be denied if: (1) any proposed activity under the plan would result in serious harm or damage to life (including fish and other aquatic life), to property, to any mineral, to the national security or defense, or to the marine, coastal, or human environment; and (2) such proposed activity cannot be modified to avoid such harm or damage.

Repeals the authority of the Secretary of the Interior to cancel the lease or permit if the plan is disapproved.

Revises requirements for review and approval of OCS oil and gas development and production plans. Requires the Secretary to seek and accept the assistance of the Department of Defense in the review of any plan prepared for a lease containing military operating stipulations or other restrictions.

Repeals the requirement that the Secretary require modification of a plan without adequate provision for safe operations on the lease area or for protection of the human, marine, or coastal environment.

Amends the Mineral Leasing Act to revise requirements for regulation of surface-disturbing activities, including preparation of exploration and development and production plans.

Eliminates the requirement of an adequate bond, surety, or other financial arrangement before commencement of surface-disturbing activities on any lease to ensure reclamation of the lease tract, and restoration of any lands or surface waters adversely affected by lease operations after abandonment or cessation of oil and gas operations on the lease. Repeals the prohibition against issuance of a lease, or approval of its assignment, if reclamation requirements and other related standards have not been complied with.