Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 06/26/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 06/26/2008
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/26/2008
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 06/26/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/26/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 07/10/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/10/2008
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/23/2008
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 07/30/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/30/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/15/2008
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/22/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/25/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/02/2008