Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 07/10/2008
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 07/14/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/17/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/22/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/22/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/22/2008
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 07/23/2008