Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3]* 06/26/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/08/2008
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 07/08/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/08/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/08/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/08/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/08/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/09/2008
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/10/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/14/2008
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/14/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/14/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/14/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/23/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/23/2008
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 09/09/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/09/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/10/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/23/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/27/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/29/2008