Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 02/08/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 02/08/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/08/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 02/08/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/08/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 02/12/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/12/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/15/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/15/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/15/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/15/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 02/15/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 02/15/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/15/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 02/15/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 02/27/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 02/27/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/27/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/06/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/06/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/06/2007
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/09/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/09/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/09/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/09/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/09/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/09/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/09/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/09/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/09/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/09/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/09/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/23/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 04/18/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/18/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/18/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/18/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 04/18/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/18/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/18/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 04/18/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/26/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/26/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/26/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/02/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/02/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 05/02/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/09/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/17/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/17/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/24/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/05/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 06/05/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/12/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/12/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/15/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 06/15/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 06/15/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/22/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/28/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/17/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/17/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 10/02/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/16/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/13/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/20/2008
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/21/2008
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 05/22/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 09/22/2008
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 09/22/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/22/2008
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/22/2008
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 09/22/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/22/2008
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/22/2008
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/22/2008
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 09/22/2008
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 09/22/2008
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 09/22/2008
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/22/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 09/22/2008
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 09/22/2008
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/22/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/22/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/22/2008
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/22/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/22/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/22/2008
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/22/2008
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/22/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/22/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/22/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/22/2008
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/22/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/22/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/22/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/22/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/22/2008
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/22/2008
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 09/22/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/22/2008