Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/10/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/17/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/17/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/17/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/17/2008
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 07/17/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/17/2008
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/17/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/17/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/17/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 07/17/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/17/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 07/17/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/17/2008
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 07/17/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/17/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 07/17/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/17/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/17/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/17/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/17/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/17/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/17/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 07/17/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/17/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/23/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/23/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/23/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/23/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/23/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/23/2008
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/23/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/23/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/23/2008
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 07/23/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/23/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/23/2008
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 07/23/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/23/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/23/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/23/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 07/23/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 07/29/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/29/2008
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 07/29/2008
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/29/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/29/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/29/2008
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/29/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 07/29/2008
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/29/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/29/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/29/2008
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/29/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 07/29/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/29/2008
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/17/2008
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 09/17/2008