Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 02/12/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/15/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/15/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/15/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 02/15/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 02/15/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/16/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/16/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/16/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 02/27/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/27/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 02/27/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 02/27/2007
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 02/27/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 02/27/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/27/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/27/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/01/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/01/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/01/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/01/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/06/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/06/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/06/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/06/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/06/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/06/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/09/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/09/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/09/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/15/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 03/15/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/15/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/19/2007
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 03/23/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/23/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 03/23/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 03/23/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/23/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/23/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/23/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 03/23/2007
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 04/18/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/18/2007
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 04/18/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 04/18/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 04/18/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/18/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/18/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/18/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/18/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/18/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 04/18/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/18/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 04/18/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/18/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/18/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/18/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 04/18/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/18/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/18/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 04/18/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/18/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/18/2007
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 04/18/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 04/18/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/18/2007
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 04/18/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/18/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/18/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/18/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/18/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/18/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/18/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/18/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 04/18/2007
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 04/18/2007
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/18/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/18/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 04/19/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/19/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 04/19/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/19/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/19/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/19/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/19/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/23/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 04/26/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 04/26/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/26/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/26/2007
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 04/26/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/26/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 04/26/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/26/2007
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 04/26/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/26/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/26/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/02/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/02/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/02/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 05/02/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/02/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/02/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/02/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 05/02/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/02/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/09/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/09/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/09/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/09/2007
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/09/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/17/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/17/2007
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/17/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/17/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/17/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/17/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/17/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 05/17/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 05/17/2007
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 05/24/2007
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 05/24/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 06/05/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/05/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 06/06/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/07/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/07/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/12/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/15/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 06/15/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 06/15/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/15/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/22/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/22/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 06/28/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/28/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/12/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/12/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/12/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/17/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/17/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/17/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/17/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/17/2007
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/17/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/19/2007
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 07/19/2007
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 07/19/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/27/2007
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 07/27/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/31/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 08/03/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 08/03/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/06/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/06/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/06/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 09/24/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 09/24/2007
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 10/02/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 10/02/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 10/02/2007
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 10/02/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 10/10/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/16/2007
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 10/16/2007
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 12/06/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 02/06/2008
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 02/13/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/25/2008
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/08/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/15/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/16/2008
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 04/16/2008
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 04/16/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/16/2008
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 04/16/2008
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/16/2008
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 04/17/2008
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 04/17/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/22/2008
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 04/22/2008
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 04/22/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/24/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/24/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/30/2008
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/05/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/13/2008
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/15/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 05/20/2008
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/20/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/20/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 05/20/2008
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/03/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 06/03/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/03/2008
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/04/2008
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/04/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 06/12/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 06/20/2008
Rep. Cazayoux, Donald J., Jr. [D-LA-6] 06/23/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/23/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/23/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/08/2008
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/29/2008
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 08/01/2008
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 09/24/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/24/2008