Refine your search

Showing 7 of 7 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
10/07/2008 Became Public Law No: 110-349.
10/07/2008 Signed by President.
09/30/2008 Presented to President.
09/26/2008 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9607)
09/24/2008 Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman without amendment. Without written report.
07/31/2008 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR 7/29/2008 H7222)
07/08/2008 Introduced in House