Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 07/09/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 07/09/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 07/09/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 07/09/2008
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 07/14/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/15/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 07/22/2008
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 07/24/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/29/2008