Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 01/23/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/24/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 01/30/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/06/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 02/08/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/12/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/05/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/05/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/09/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/07/2007