Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 07/10/2008
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 07/10/2008
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/15/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 07/15/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/15/2008
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/15/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/15/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/16/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 07/16/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 07/23/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 07/23/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/23/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/24/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/24/2008
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/29/2008
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/29/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/29/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/30/2008
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 07/30/2008
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 07/31/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 09/08/2008
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 09/09/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 09/10/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/17/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/23/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/23/2008
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 09/24/2008
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 11/19/2008