Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/16/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/16/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/17/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/17/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/24/2008
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/29/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/29/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/29/2008
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/30/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/30/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/30/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/08/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/08/2008