Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/15/2008
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/15/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/15/2008
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 07/15/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/15/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/15/2008
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 07/15/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 07/15/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 07/15/2008
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 07/15/2008
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/15/2008
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 07/15/2008
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/15/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/15/2008
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 07/15/2008
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/15/2008
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/15/2008
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/15/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/15/2008
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 07/15/2008
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 07/15/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/16/2008
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/16/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/16/2008
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 07/16/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 07/16/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/16/2008
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/17/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 07/17/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/17/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/17/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/22/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/22/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/22/2008
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/23/2008
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 07/23/2008
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/29/2008
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 07/29/2008
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/29/2008
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 07/29/2008
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 07/29/2008
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 07/31/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 08/01/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 09/08/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/08/2008