Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 01/24/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 01/24/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 01/24/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 01/24/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 01/29/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 01/29/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 01/29/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 01/29/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 01/31/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 02/15/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 02/16/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 03/26/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/15/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/06/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 10/17/2007