Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 07/15/2008
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 07/23/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/29/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 07/29/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 07/29/2008
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 07/30/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/30/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/31/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/10/2008