Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 07/15/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 07/15/2008
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 07/15/2008
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 07/15/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 07/15/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/24/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/24/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/24/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/24/2008
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 07/24/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/30/2008
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/30/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/09/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/23/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/23/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/02/2008